This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/27/2021 at 14:53:10 (UTC).

ABC LANDING VS L D BURCH

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 ABC LANDING filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against L D BURCH. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC LANDCLEARING DEVELOPMENT INC

Defendants

123 LUCKY STREET LAND TRUST

580 Lucky St

Titusville, FL 32780-4131

JOHNSON COREY

Mims, FL 32754-4102

Trustee

BURCH LEON DOZIE

Titusville, FL 32780-4131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BABB ETHAN B

1901 S Harbor City Blvd Ste 505

Melbourne, FL 32901-4770

Trustee Attorney

VIDONI NICHOLAS A

959 N Cocoa Blvd Ste 5

Cocoa, FL 32922-7565

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

11/18/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/20/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/19/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

10/05/2020: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

DEFAULT ENTERED

09/22/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

09/18/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

09/01/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/20/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

08/07/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

07/27/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/27/2020: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC LANDCLEARING DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIDONI NICHOLAS A