This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 09:13:06 (UTC).

A RICHARDSON VS PEOPLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 A RICHARDSON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PEOPLE TRUST. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARDSON ANGELA

Defendant

PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer, Ra, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH JENNIFER J

7700 Congress Ave Ste 3111

Boca Raton, FL 33487-1357

Defendant Attorney

GELLERMAN SARAH ELIZABETH

18 Peoples Trust Way

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441-6270

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/09/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/25/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/23/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/23/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

09/23/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/23/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

09/23/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S178786; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JENNIFER J SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S178786; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JENNIFER J SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less