This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:23:43 (UTC).

A LYONS-YOUNG VS A YOUNG SR

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 A LYONS-YOUNG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against A YOUNG SR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI and LESLIE J CASTALDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI

LESLIE J CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LYONS AQUATIA DARCELL

Rockledge, FL 32956-1573

LYONS-YOUNG AQUATIA DARCELL

Rockledge, FL 32956-1573

Respondent

YOUNG ANTONIO JEROME

Palm Bay, FL 32909

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: LESLIE J CASTALDI; Matter Type: NON JURY TRIAL; Result: CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCAL:NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2020
  • Docket(#16) ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER LESLIE CASTALDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#13) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#6) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#3) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#1) SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCIR FAM ORIG-INDIGENT NO FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less