This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 22:14:53 (UTC).

A E DUNN VS CARLYLE D BRACKETT

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 A E DUNN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CARLYLE D BRACKETT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINA SERRANO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINA SERRANO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUNN ADRIANNA ELAINE

Respondent

BRACKETT CARLYLE DEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRSCHD-ADDRESS UNKNOWN-VERIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docket(#18) RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketRSCHD-ADDRESS UPDATED-REMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: CHRISTINA SERRANO; Matter Type: INJUNCTION HEARING; Result: CR: INJUNCTION HRG HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docket(#17) INJUNCTION ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCR: INJUNCTION HRG HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketOTHER NOTATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMIN: COURT TO PREPARE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMIN: COURT DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#7) INJUNCTION FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM TO LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docket(#1) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: NO FEE AUTHORIZED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/CHILDREN; Judge: CHRISTINA SERRANO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less