Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County on 03/16/2020 at 13:37:43 (UTC).

State of Florida Vs Foucha, Sukeil

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 State of Florida filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Foucha, Sukeil. This case was filed in Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Pole, Christopher W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********M10A

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Pole, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Defendants

Foucha, Sukeil

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33311

Fouche, Sukeil

Foucha, Shukeil

Fouche, Shukiel

Foucha, Sakeil

Foucha, Shukiel

Not Yet Classified

State of Florida

 

Court Documents

Hrg Held %2f Magistrate Findings%2fOrder - Probable Cause Found

1/2/2019 - Hrg Held %2f Magistrate Findings%2fOrder - Probable Cause Found

File Court%27s Notice Of Hearing

4/15/2019 - File Court%27s Notice Of Hearing

Arrest Paperwork

1/2/2019 - Arrest Paperwork

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Court's Notice Of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $0.0; Total Imposed Amount: $0.0; Total Amount Due: $0.0; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $0.0; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $308.0; Total Imposed Amount: $308.0; Total Amount Due: $308.0; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $308.0; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Date: 06/02/2019; Next Payment Amount: $308.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionDisposition(s); Disposition; Dismissed; Charge: 2; Offense Date: 01/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionPlea(s); Plea; Magistrate Nolo Contendere; Charge: 2; Offense Date: 01/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionSentence(s); (G) - Fine and/or Costs; (Judicial Officer(s): Mollica, Kim Theresa); Comment (TAI: $308 // Partial payments accepted // Defer Date:06/02/2019 // Judicial notice for time served in bcj )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionDisposition(s); Disposition; Convicted by Plea - Adjudication Withheld; Charge: 1; Offense Date: 01/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionPlea(s); Plea; Magistrate Nolo Contendere; Charge: 1; Offense Date: 01/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHrg Held / Magistrate Findings/Order - Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketElectronic Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArrest Paperwork

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargeRiding Bike with no or Improper Light; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (0)316.2065(7); Filing Type: Filed at Magistrate; Filing Agency: Sunrise PD; Original Statute: (0)316.2065(7)-Riding Bike with no or Improper Light; Charge: 2; Degree: (0)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargePossess Cannabis/20 Grams Or Less; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (M1)893.13(6)(B); Filing Type: Filed at Magistrate; Filing Agency: Sunrise PD; Original Statute: (M1)893.13(6)(B)-Possess Cannabis/20 Grams Or Less; Charge: 1; Degree: (M1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Foucha, Sukeil; Offense: Riding Bike with no or Improper Light; Degree: (0); Statute: 316.2065(7); OBTS Number: 0609249400; Charge: 2; Arrest Number: SN19000003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Foucha, Sukeil; Offense: Possess Cannabis/20 Grams Or Less; Degree: (M1); Statute: 893.13(6)(B); OBTS Number: 0609249400; Charge: 1; Arrest Number: SN19000003

    Read MoreRead Less