Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County on 03/11/2020 at 08:37:06 (UTC).

State of Florida Vs Downes, Laurie Ellen

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 State of Florida filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Downes, Laurie Ellen. This case was filed in Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mollica, Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********M10A

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mollica, Kim

 

Party Details

Defendants

Downes, Laurie Ellen

Davie, FL 33325

Downes, Laurie

Dowas, Laurie

Down, Laurie

Doan, Liz

Downnes, Laurie

Donnes, Laurie

Duan, Liz

Downs, Laurie E

Downs, Laurie

Downes, Laurie E

Not Yet Classified

State of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Edgley, Jennifer L

201 Se 6Th St, Ste 3872

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-3332

Public Defender

Chung, William Wonil

Attorney at Law office of the Public Defender

201 Se 6Th St., Suite 3872

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

File State Amended Information

3/6/2019 - File State Amended Information

File States Information

1/24/2019 - File States Information

Arrest Paperwork

2/16/2019 - Arrest Paperwork

File Notice Of Confidential Info Within Court Filing

1/2/2019 - File Notice Of Confidential Info Within Court Filing

Court Disposition

3/11/2019 - Court Disposition

File Def Affidavit Indigency%2fDeclared Indigent

3/5/2019 - File Def Affidavit Indigency%2fDeclared Indigent

Arrest Paperwork

1/2/2019 - Arrest Paperwork

Demand for Disclosure of Impeaching Information

2/20/2019 - Demand for Disclosure of Impeaching Information

File State%27s Instruction Sheet

1/24/2019 - File State%27s Instruction Sheet

Review of Motor Vehicles - Property Records

3/5/2019 - Review of Motor Vehicles - Property Records

Capias Issued

2/11/2019 - Capias Issued

Hrg Held %2f Magistrate Findings%2fOrder - Probable Cause Found

1/2/2019 - Hrg Held %2f Magistrate Findings%2fOrder - Probable Cause Found

Court Date Notice

2/1/2019 - Court Date Notice

Plea of guilty or No contest for Criminal in County Court

3/11/2019 - Plea of guilty or No contest for Criminal in County Court

Post Office Returned Mail

10/30/2019 - Post Office Returned Mail

Post Office Returned Mail

11/22/2019 - Post Office Returned Mail

File Notice%2fAssistant PD Assignment

2/20/2019 - File Notice%2fAssistant PD Assignment

Court Date Notice

2/21/2019 - Court Date Notice

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $463.05; Total Imposed Amount: $293.0; Total Amount Due: $463.05; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $463.05; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Date: 09/11/2019; Next Payment Amount: $463.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • DocketSent To Law Firm For Collections; Linebarger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPost Office Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • DocketCourt Defer/60 Days Past Due; $343.00; Amount: $343.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPost Office Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCourt Defer/30 Days Past Due; $343.00; Amount: $343.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketD6/ Fin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Public Defender Fees; $50.00; Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • HearingArraignment; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): Mollica - MT, Kim; Location: Room 5155; Arrgn que

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DispositionSentence(s); (G) - Fine and/or Costs; (Judicial Officer(s): Mollica, Kim Theresa); Comment (TAI: $293 // Partial Payments Accepted // Defer Date: 09/11/2019 // No Return To: Dunkin Donuts 13190 SR 84 Davie, FL )

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketReceived Original State Attorneys Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Date Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile States Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile State's Instruction Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketElectronic Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHrg Held / Magistrate Findings/Order - Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArrest Paperwork

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Notice Of Confidential Info Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargeTrespass After Warning; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (M1)810.09(2)(b); Filing Type: SAO Information; Filing Agency: Davie PD; Original Statute: (M1)810.09(2)(b)-Trespass After Warning; Charge: 1; Degree: (M1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Downes, Laurie Ellen; Offense: Trespass After Warning; Degree: (M1); Statute: 810.09(2)(b); OBTS Number: 0607251496; Charge: 1; Arrest Number: DV19000003

    Read MoreRead Less