Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County on 03/23/2020 at 13:04:40 (UTC).

State of Florida Vs Chavarria, Christian Antoino

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 State of Florida filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Chavarria, Christian Antoino. This case was filed in Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brown, Melinda. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********M10A

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seventeenth Circuit Courts - Broward County

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brown, Melinda

 

Party Details

Defendants

Chavarria, Christian Antoino

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Christain, Chavarria

Chavarria, Christian Ant

Chavarria, Christian A

Not Yet Classified

State of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Edgley, Jennifer L

201 Se 6Th St, Ste 3872

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-3332

Kruss, Ramiro G.

Attorney at Law office of the Public Defender

201 Se 6Th St., Suite 3872

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

McNickles, Belinda Fay

Attorney at Public Defender's Office

 

Court Documents

Court Date Notice

2/25/2019 - Court Date Notice

Court Date Notice

6/27/2019 - Court Date Notice

Court Disposition

1/8/2020 - Court Disposition

Defense Notice of Taking Depositions

5/15/2019 - Defense Notice of Taking Depositions

Arrest Paperwork

1/2/2019 - Arrest Paperwork

File Notice

7/23/2019 - File Notice

File Notice%2fAssistant PD Assignment

1/4/2019 - File Notice%2fAssistant PD Assignment

File Order Of Probation

7/31/2019 - File Order Of Probation

File State%27s Instruction Sheet

2/19/2019 - File State%27s Instruction Sheet

File Order Of Immobilization

7/23/2019 - File Order Of Immobilization

Court Date Notice Returned

9/5/2019 - Court Date Notice Returned

File Defense Motion To Set Bond

10/4/2019 - File Defense Motion To Set Bond

File Affidavit And Warrant Violation Of Probation

9/17/2019 - File Affidavit And Warrant Violation Of Probation

File Plea Agreement

10/4/2019 - File Plea Agreement

File States Information

2/19/2019 - File States Information

Hrg Held %2f Magistrate Findings%2fOrder - Probable Cause Found

1/2/2019 - Hrg Held %2f Magistrate Findings%2fOrder - Probable Cause Found

Court Disposition

7/23/2019 - Court Disposition

File Court%27s Notice Of Hearing

3/12/2019 - File Court%27s Notice Of Hearing

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCourt Defer/60 Days Past Due; $1,129.00; Amount: $1,129.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCourt Defer/30 Days Past Due; $1,129.00; Amount: $1,129.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $28.0; Total Imposed Amount: $28.0; Total Amount Due: $28.0; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $28.0; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Date: 12/27/2019; Next Payment Amount: $28.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketD6/ Fin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $0.0; Citation Number:00A9SRP3E; Total Imposed Amount: $0.0; Total Amount Due: $0.0; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $0.0; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $0.0; Citation Number:00A9SRP2E; Total Imposed Amount: $0.0; Total Amount Due: $0.0; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $0.0; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialBalance Due: $1101.0; Citation Number:00A9SRP4E; Total Imposed Amount: $1001.0; Total Amount Due: $1101.0; Total Amount Paid: $0.0; Current Amount Due: $1101.0; Last Payment Amount: $0.0; Next Payment Date: 12/27/2019; Next Payment Amount: $1101.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview of Motor Vehicles - Property Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Def Affidavit Indigency/Declared Indigent

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArrest Paperwork

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHrg Held / Magistrate Findings/Order - Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargeExpired Tag Less Than 6 Months; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (0)320.07(3)(A); Filing Type: None; Filing Agency: Wilton Manors PD; Original Statute: (0)320.07(3)(A)-Expired Tag Less Than 6 Months; Charge: 4; Degree: (0); Citation Number: A9SRP3E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargeImproper Change Of Lanes; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (0)316.085(2); Filing Type: None; Filing Agency: Wilton Manors PD; Original Statute: (0)316.085(2)-Improper Change Of Lanes; Charge: 3; Degree: (0); Citation Number: A9SRP2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargePossess Cannabis/20 Grams Or Less; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (M1)893.13(6)(B); Filing Type: SAO Information; Filing Agency: Wilton Manors PD; Original Statute: (M1)893.13(6)(B)-Possess Cannabis/20 Grams Or Less; Charge: 2; Degree: (M1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ChargeDriving Under The Influence; Date Filed: 01/01/2019; Current Statute: (M1)316.193(1); Filing Type: SAO Information; Filing Agency: Wilton Manors PD; Original Statute: (M1)316.193(1)-Driving Under The Influence; Charge: 1; Degree: (M1); Citation Number: A9SRP4E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Chavarria, Christian Antoino; Offense: Expired Tag Less Than 6 Months; Degree: (0); Statute: 320.07(3)(A); OBTS Number: 0609249392; Charge: 4; Arrest Number: WM19000001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Chavarria, Christian Antoino; Offense: Improper Change Of Lanes ; Degree: (0); Statute: 316.085(2); OBTS Number: 0609249392; Charge: 3; Arrest Number: WM19000001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Chavarria, Christian Antoino; Offense: Possess Cannabis/20 Grams Or Less; Degree: (M1); Statute: 893.13(6)(B); OBTS Number: 0609249392; Charge: 2; Arrest Number: WM19000001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • ArrestArrest; Name At Arrest: Chavarria, Christian Antoino; Offense: Driving Under The Influence; Degree: (M1); Statute: 316.193(1); OBTS Number: 0609249392; Charge: 1; Arrest Number: WM19000001

    Read MoreRead Less