This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/10/2022 at 10:21:59 (UTC).

Priority Title Inc Plaintiff vs. Charles Gilbert, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/18/2004 Priority Title Inc Plaintiff filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Charles Gilbert, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kanner, Daniel J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9758

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kanner, Daniel J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Priority Title Inc

Defendants

Gilbert, Charles

Gilbert, Julie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silverman, Marc A

Merino, Michael H

Defendant Attorney

Chennault, William, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/12/2009

DispositionSatisfaction of Judgment; Comment (Satisfaction Of Jgmt: Fld & Rec (1rv) )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2009

DocketSubpoena Returned Served; Subp Svd 07/07/09-Deputy Charles Gilbert (1ca)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2009

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Not Of Taking Depo Dt In Aid Of Execution Of Pl Rcvd 07/08/09 (1ck)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2009

DocketRe-open Case Fee > $500; $50.00 Reopen Case Fee Paid By Pl & For: Mot To Enforce Settlement (Previously Filed) (1lc); Amount: $50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2008

DocketCert Copy Jgmt Issued; 2/cert Copy Jgmt Issd To Atty (1rv); Amount: $6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2008

DispositionFinal Judgment for Plaintiff; Comment (Final Jgmt For Pl: Fld & Rec (9/4/08)-Final Judgment Be And The Same Is Hereby Entered In Favor Of The Plaintiff And Against The Defendant In The Sum Of $ 11027.85 Plus Statutory Post Judgment Interest Of 11% For Which Let Execution Issue (1sg) )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2008

DocketAffidavit; Pl Aff Of Default Under Settlement Agreement X (1sg)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2008

DocketAffidavit of Attorney Fees; Pl Aff For Atty'S Fees X (1sg)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2008

DocketRe-Notice of Hearing; Re-Not Of Hrg 08/07/08 @11:00am Rm#358-Pl Mot To Enforce Settlement (1rc)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2008

DocketRe-open Case Fee > $500; $50.00 Reopen Case Fee Paid By Pl & For: Mot/enforce Settlement (1dj); Amount: $50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
06/18/2004

DocketCertified Copy; C C Of Order To Transfer From Co-We-04-006165 (1mf)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2004

DocketRandom Assignment; Random Assignment Subd:49 (1mf)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2004

DocketNo Fee; No Fee Paid (1mf)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2004

DispositionOrder of Transfer; Comment (Ord Of Transfer: Fld & Rec S-6/10/04 To Cty Civil Central For Jury Trial (4bb) )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2004

DocketSummons Returned Served; Sums Svd 5/10/04-Charles (4kh)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2004

DocketSummons Returned Served; Sums Svd 5/10/04-Julie (4kh)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2004

DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Sums Issd Process Server Charles (4bi)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2004

DocketSummons Issued to Process Server; Sums Issd Process Server Julie (4bi)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2004

DocketRandom Assignment; Random Assignment 06/10/04 10:30 Subd:81 (4af)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2004

DocketStatement of Claim; Statement Of Claim (4af); Amount: $174.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less