This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/01/2022 at 07:37:17 (UTC).

Drillot Corporation Plaintiff vs. SDC Home Appliances Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/05/2010 Drillot Corporation Plaintiff filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SDC Home Appliances Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McHugh, Kathleen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5456

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McHugh, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Drillot Corporation

Hadco

Defendants

SDC Home Appliances Inc

Glickman, David

Glickman, Joan

Spazio Di Casa Appliances Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gebeloff, Stephen B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/16/2010

DispositionFinal Judgment; Comment ((09/15/10) ); Monetary Award/Costs - (Awarded To: Drillot Corporation),(Awarded Against: SDC Home Appliances Inc),(Comment:6% interest let execution issue) ,(Principal:11,392.73) ,(Court Costs:465.00) ,(Attorneys Fee:412.50) ,(Total Fees:12270.23)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2010

DispositionDisposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2010

DocketMotion for Final Judgment; X; Party: Plaintiff Drillot Corporation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2010

DocketMotion for Default & Default; all df

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

DocketSummons Returned Served; 4/24/10-David

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

DocketSummons Returned Served; 4/24/10-Sdc Home

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

DocketSummons Returned Served; 4/24/10-Joan

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2010

DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: Gebeloff, Stephen B ; Userid: CTS-lray ; Receipt: 20101YF1A002207; Amount: $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2010

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: Gebeloff, Stephen B ; Userid: CTS-lray ; Receipt: 20101YF1A002207; Amount: $30.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2010

DocketSummons Issued to Attorney; Party: Defendant Glickman, David

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2010

DocketSummons Issued to Attorney; Party: Defendant Glickman, Joan

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2010

DocketSummons Issued to Attorney; Party: Defendant SDC Home Appliances Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2010

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2010

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less