This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/15/2021 at 14:55:10 (UTC).

Zimmerman Advertising LLC Plaintiff vs. Modern Automotive Network LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/05/2012 Zimmerman Advertising LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Modern Automotive Network LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1156

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zimmerman Advertising LLC

Defendant

Modern Automotive Network LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lines, Matthew L

Defendant Attorney

Kennady, Marian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/18/2012

DispositionVoluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2012

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2012

DocketSummons Returned Served; 11/8/12; Party: Defendant Modern Automotive Network LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2012

DocketNotice of Limited Appearance; Marian G Kennady Esq; Party: Defendant Modern Automotive Network LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2012

DocketSummons Issued; Party: Defendant Modern Automotive Network LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2012

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2012

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2012

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ISICOFF RAGATZ KOENIGSBERG ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007156; Comments: CK#5302 ; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2012

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ISICOFF RAGATZ KOENIGSBERG ; Userid: CTS-mpreto ; Receipt: 20121YE1C007156; Comments: CK#5302 ; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less