This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:17:17 (UTC).

Xaelah Thompson Plaintiff vs. Francisco Javier Morales Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Xaelah Thompson Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Francisco Javier Morales Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5741

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson, Xaelah

Defendant

Morales, Francisco Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wolfson, Jonah M

Attorney at Wolfson Law Firm LLP

3399 Southwest 3Rd Avenue

Miami, FL 33145

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Interrogatories

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

9/23/2020 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Request for Copies

9/23/2020 - Request for Copies

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

9/23/2020 - Request to Produce

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Thompson, Xaelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; Party: Plaintiff Thompson, Xaelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; eservice2@wolfsonlawf irm.com; Party: Plaintiff Thompson, Xaelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies; Party: Plaintiff Thompson, Xaelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Thompson, Xaelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Party: Plaintiff Thompson, Xaelah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Morales, Francisco Javier

    Read MoreRead Less