This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/20/2023 at 02:31:43 (UTC).

WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST Plaintiff vs. ERICK PINZON Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERICK PINZON Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cawthon, Corey Amanda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0942

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cawthon, Corey Amanda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST

Defendant

PINZON, ERICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/3/2023 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/3/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

3/8/2023 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice

3/15/2023 - Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 61 Cawthon, Corey Amanda; Location: South Courtroom 230

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 61 Cawthon, Corey Amanda; Location: South Courtroom 230; CANCELED: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Additional Text; OF STAND-IN COUNSEL LIMITED APPEARANCE; Party: Plaintiff WSFS FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR CVI AMR INVESTMENT TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less