This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/06/2021 at 23:45:23 (UTC).

Wilton Manors HA, LLC, et al Plaintiff vs. Tax Collector for Broward County, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 Wilton Manors HA, LLC, Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Tax Collector for Broward County, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6540

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

High Acres Company, LLC

High Acres TIC, LLC

Wilton Manors HA, LLC

Defendants

Department of Revenue for the State of Florida

Lori Parrish, Property Apraiser, Broward Cty, Fl

Tax Collector for Broward County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenwood, Joel D

Defendant Attorneys

Mc Auley, James

Schwartzreich, Mila

 

Court Documents

Pretrial Conference Order

7/24/2014 - Pretrial Conference Order

Notice of Unavailability

7/2/2014 - Notice of Unavailability

Response to Request for Production

6/17/2014 - Response to Request for Production

Notice to Set Case for Trial

6/11/2014 - Notice to Set Case for Trial

Affidavit of Service

5/27/2014 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

5/27/2014 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

5/27/2014 - Affidavit of Service

Answer

5/13/2014 - Answer

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

5/12/2014 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request for Production of Documents

5/8/2014 - Request for Production of Documents

Answer to Amended Complaint

5/5/2014 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Amended Answer to Amended Complaint

5/5/2014 - Amended Answer to Amended Complaint

Notice of Appearance

5/5/2014 - Notice of Appearance

Answer to Amended Complaint

5/5/2014 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Affidavit of Service

4/28/2014 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

4/28/2014 - Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

4/28/2014 - Affidavit of Service

Answer

4/25/2014 - Answer

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/08/2015

DispositionDisposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionStipulated Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 51313; Page: 538; 3 Pages; Instrument Number: 112694463

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2014
View Court Documents

DocketPretrial Conference Order; 12/01/14 & CCall 11/20/14 at 10:00 rm 770 / Non-Jury

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability; MILA SCHWARTZREICH, General Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2014
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Request for Production; REPLY TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION by Plaintiff WILTON MANORS HA, LLC; HIGH ACRES TIC, LLC; and HIGH ACRES COMPANY, LLC; Party: Defendant Tax Collector for Broward County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Set Case for Trial; Party: Plaintiff Wilton Manors HA, LLC; Party: Plaintiff High Acres Company, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2014
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; SUMMONS SERVED 04/24/2014; Party: Defendant Department of Revenue for the State of Florida

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2014
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; SUMMONS SERVED 04/24/2014; Party: Defendant Tax Collector for Broward County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2014
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; SUMMONS SERVED 04/24/2014; Party: Defendant Lori Parrish, Property Apraiser, Broward Cty, Fl

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2014
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Tax Collector for Broward County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
04/07/2014

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: JOEL D. KENWOOD ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A044488; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2014

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOEL D. KENWOOD ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A044488; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2014

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOEL D. KENWOOD ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A044488; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2014

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOEL D. KENWOOD ESQ. ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A044488; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Florida Department of Revenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Tax Collector for Broward County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Wilton Manors HA, LLC; Party: Plaintiff High Acres TIC, LLC; Party: Plaintiff High Acres Company, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Lori Parrish, Property Apraiser, Broward Cty, Fl

[+] Read More [-] Read Less