This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/11/2020 at 14:31:22 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Plaintiff vs. Eddy Germain, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Eddy Germain, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5977

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Upland Mortgage Loan Trust A

Defendants

Waterside At Spring Valley Homeowners Association

Spring Valley Phase III Homeowners Association Inc

Spring Valley Property Owners Association Inc

Germain, Michelle

Germain, Eddy

Spring Valley Swim Club Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruggerio, Jason Kyle

 

Court Documents

Certificate

12/31/2019 - Certificate

Notice of Change of Address

12/12/2019 - Notice of Change of Address

Motion for Writ of Possession

11/20/2019 - Motion for Writ of Possession

Affidavit

11/20/2019 - Affidavit

Bid Sheet

10/30/2019 - Bid Sheet

Proof of Publication

10/1/2019 - Proof of Publication

Affidavit of Compliance

8/28/2019 - Affidavit of Compliance

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/17/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Summons Returned Unserved

4/24/2019 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

4/24/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

4/24/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

3/18/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Lis Pendens

3/18/2019 - Lis Pendens

eSummons Issuance

3/18/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/18/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/18/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/18/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Dropping Party(S)

4/25/2019 - Notice of Dropping Party(S)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate; of disbursements and title

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Firm Name Change; Jason Ruggerio Esq Atty for Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder/Issue Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2019

DocketCertificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2019

DocketCertificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; MICHELLE GERMAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHELLE GERMAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; EDDY GERMAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDDY GERMAIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; SPRING VALLEY PHASE III HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; SPRING VALLEY SWIM CLUB, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; SPRING VALLEY PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; WATERSIDE AT SPRING VALLEY HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less