This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/22/2021 at 16:09:30 (UTC).

William Womick, et al Plaintiff vs. Holy Cross Hospital, Inc , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 William Womick, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Holy Cross Hospital, Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowman, John B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4316

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bowman, John B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Womick, William

The Estate of Melinda Womick

Defendants

Holy Cross Hospital, Inc

Holy Cross Health

Robinson, Janet, MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levine, Lisa S

Attorney at Lisa S Levine, PA

2800 Weston Road, Suite 202

Weston, FL 33331

 

Court Documents

Petition (eFiled)

7/15/2021 - Petition (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

7/20/2021 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); PETITION FOR NINETY DAY EXTENSION TO STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS; Party: Plaintiff Womick, William

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holy Cross Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE, LISA SUE