This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2023 at 02:10:37 (UTC).

Westlake Services LLC Plaintiff vs. Rolandie G Jean Baptiste Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Westlake Services LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rolandie G Jean Baptiste Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eves, Tabitha Blackmon. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0309

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eves, Tabitha Blackmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Westlake Services LLC

Westlake Financial Services

Defendant

Jean Baptiste, Rolandie G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Winter, Robert A

Alvarez, Melissa

 

Court Documents

Notice

2/1/2023 - Notice

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/1/2023 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/1/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/3/2023 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/7/2023 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Eves, Tabitha Blackmon; Location: West Courtroom 240

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference; Comment (-Dismissed--Pltf did not appear ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118713450

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Jean Baptiste, Rolandie G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Additional Text; OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less