This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/31/2023 at 10:22:32 (UTC).

West Coast Servicing Inc Plaintiff vs. Juana Blanco , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 West Coast Servicing Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Juana Blanco , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Garcia-Wood, Marina. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3860

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Garcia-Wood, Marina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West Coast Servicing Inc

Defendants

Broward County Clerk of Court

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association Inc

Harms Software Inc

Blanco , Juana

American Express Bank FSB

Manufacturers and Traders Trust Co

Sovereign Bank

Castillo , Juan Manuel

United States of America

Department of Treasury- Internal Revenue Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Medley, Ashland Roberts, ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

Prieto, Sarah

Wilder, Leonard

 

Court Documents

Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale

9/17/2021 - Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale

Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale

9/13/2021 - Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale

Proof of Publication

8/25/2021 - Proof of Publication

Satisfaction of Judgment

9/13/2021 - Satisfaction of Judgment

Final Disposition Form

8/10/2021 - Final Disposition Form

Certificate of Service

8/10/2021 - Certificate of Service

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

8/10/2021 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Certificate of Service

8/10/2021 - Certificate of Service

Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage

7/29/2021 - Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage

Notice of Filing

7/26/2021 - Notice of Filing

Letter to Judge

7/13/2021 - Letter to Judge

Notice of Filing

7/13/2021 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

6/21/2021 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing Affidavit

6/17/2021 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

Notice of Filing

6/17/2021 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Intent

6/17/2021 - Notice of Intent

Amended Notice of Hearing

6/17/2021 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice

6/11/2021 - Notice

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2021

HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com; CANCELED: Cancelled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale; Additional Text; September 28 2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021
View Court Documents

DispositionDisposition(s): Satisfaction of Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 3; Instrument Number: 117596299

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff West Coast Servicing Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketDescription: Comment:; Additional Text; File Created Original loan documents (Note and Mortgage) placed in file

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Final Disposition Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Certificate of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Certificate of Service; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff West Coast Servicing Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; SUNSET FALLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; SOVEREIGN BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST CO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; HARMS SOFTWARE, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; SOUND SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; BROWARD COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less