This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 12/28/2021 at 15:25:29 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank NA Plaintiff vs. Sandra A Mair Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/26/2011 Wells Fargo Bank NA Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Sandra A Mair Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2039

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Wachovia Bank Na

Defendants

Mair, Sandra A

Mair, Sandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cohen, Marc B

Defendant Attorney

Scheflin, Bonne Z

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Dismissal

12/5/2014 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

12/12/2014 - Order of Dismissal

Notice of Unavailability

8/8/2013 - Notice of Unavailability

Order Setting Case Management Conference

7/9/2014 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Motion for Mediation

9/18/2014 - Motion for Mediation

Order

10/28/2014 - Order

Directions to the Clerk

12/12/2014 - Directions to the Clerk

Stipulation for Dismissal

12/12/2014 - Stipulation for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

12/12/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionOrder of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 51317; Page: 1539; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112697532

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2014
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation for Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2014
View Court Documents

DocketDirections to the Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionStipulation for Dismissal; Vol./Book: 51312; Page: 1884; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112694228

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2014

DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder; PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION/ granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2014
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Mediation; Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Unavailability; Party: Attorney Scheflin, Bonne Z

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2012

DocketResponse; /Objections to Defendant's request for production; Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
06/14/2011

DocketMotion for Entry; Of Deft; Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2011

DocketMotion to Dismiss; pl complaint; Party: Defendant Mair, Sandra A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2011

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Mair, Sandra A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2011

DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; to file responsive pleading to complaint; Party: Defendant Mair, Sandra A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2011

DocketSummons Returned Served; 1/27/11 / Sandra A Mair aka Sandra Mair; Party: Defendant Mair, Sandra A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2011

DocketSummons Issued; Party: Defendant Mair, Sandra A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2011

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2011

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2011

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: Cohen, Marc B ; Userid: CTS-jsimmons ; Receipt: 20113YA3B000284; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2011

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: Cohen, Marc B ; Userid: CTS-jsimmons ; Receipt: 20113YA3B000284; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less