This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/04/2020 at 14:04:31 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Plaintiff vs. Elizabeth Magrisso, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Wells Fargo Bank, N A Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Elizabeth Magrisso, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1200

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendants

Levy, Opher

Magrisso, Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Stuart M

Attorney at Albertelli Law

P.O. Box 23028

Tampa, FL 33623

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Unserved

2/1/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

2/1/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

2/1/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/1/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

1/22/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/22/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/22/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Value Claim Form

1/22/2020 - Value Claim Form

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 01/30/20; Party: Defendant Levy, Opher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 1/30/2020; Party: Defendant Magrisso, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $383,995.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE; Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form; Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Levy, Opher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Magrisso, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less