This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2023 at 10:07:48 (UTC).

Waterside at Spring Valley Homeowners Association Plaintiff vs. Jerry Mendez, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Waterside at Spring Valley Homeowners Association Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Jerry Mendez, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4492

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Waterside at Spring Valley Homeowners Association

Defendants

Mendez, Jerry

Mendez, Genevieve

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilder, Leonard

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

3/25/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/25/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

3/25/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/25/2022 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

3/25/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

4/20/2022 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

3/29/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Summons Returned Served

4/5/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

4/5/2022 - Summons Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118092568

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 31st day of March, 2022; Party: Defendant Mendez, Jerry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 31st day of March, 2022; Party: Defendant Mendez, Genevieve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; JERRY MENDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; GENEVIEVE MENDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less