This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/18/2020 at 13:11:15 (UTC).

VRS/Broadstone Cypress Hammocks LLC Plaintiff vs. Erum Mohammad, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 VRS/Broadstone Cypress Hammocks LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Erum Mohammad, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohen, Mardi Levey. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2608

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cohen, Mardi Levey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VRS/Broadstone Cypress Hammocks LLC

Defendants

Mohammad Jaferi, Fraz

Mohammad, Erum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion

2/11/2019 - Motion

Stipulation for-of Settlement

2/11/2019 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Summons Served-Posted

2/5/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Summons Served-Posted

2/5/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Certificate of Mailing

1/30/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/24/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Order Approving Settlement

2/19/2019 - Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115624342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL; Party: Plaintiff VRS/Broadstone Cypress Hammocks LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement; STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; Party: Plaintiff VRS/Broadstone Cypress Hammocks LLC; Party: Defendant Mohammad Jaferi, Fraz; Party: Defendant Mohammad, Erum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/30/19; Party: Defendant Mohammad Jaferi, Fraz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/30/19; Party: Defendant Mohammad, Erum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; (BOTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A013452; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A013452; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: KENNETH J LOWENHAUPT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A013452; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Mohammad, Erum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Mohammad Jaferi, Fraz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less