This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/26/2020 at 14:39:08 (UTC).

Vizcaya Community Association, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Suegal Adnel Pena Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Vizcaya Community Association, Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Suegal Adnel Pena Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5567

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vizcaya Community Association, Inc.

Defendant

Pena, Suegal Adnel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesias, David D, ESQ.

Attorney at IGLESIAS LAW GROUP, P.A

15800 Pines Blvd Ste 303

Pembroke Pines, FL 33027-1212

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/22/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/21/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Lis Pendens

9/21/2020 - Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

9/21/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR FORECLOSURE; Party: Plaintiff Vizcaya Community Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Pena, Suegal Adnel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SUEGAL ADNEL PENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vizcaya Community Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iglesias, David D