This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/29/2020 at 12:35:05 (UTC).

Vizcaya Community Association, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Juan Carlos Medina Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Vizcaya Community Association, Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Juan Carlos Medina Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5517

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vizcaya Community Association, Inc.

Defendant

Medina, Juan Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesias, David D, ESQ.

Attorney at IGLESIAS LAW GROUP, P.A

15800 Pines Blvd Ste 303

Pembroke Pines, FL 33027-1212

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/22/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/21/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/21/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/21/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/21/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; To the above Defendants, if they be living; and, if they be dead, the unknown Defendants who may be spouses, heirs, devisees successors or assigns of such Defendants, and additional unknown Defendants as successors in interest, grantees, assignees, lienors, creditors, trustees and all parties claiming interest by

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR FORECLOSURE; Party: Plaintiff Vizcaya Community Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN CARLOS MEDINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Medina, Juan Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vizcaya Community Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iglesias, David D