This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 14:35:08 (UTC).

Vizcaya Community Association Inc. Plaintiff vs. Alexander Polo, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 Vizcaya Community Association Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Alexander Polo, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7414

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vizcaya Community Association Inc.

Defendants

Polo, Alexander

Unkown Spouse of Alexander Polo

Unknown Tenant Two

Unknown Spouse of Linette Naranjo

Unknown Tenanat One

Naranjo, Linette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesias, David D, ESQ.

Attorney at IGLESIAS LAW GROUP, P.A

15800 Pines Blvd Ste 303

Pembroke Pines, FL 33027-1212

 

Court Documents

Notice of Firm Name Change

4/24/2019 - Notice of Firm Name Change

Stipulation for-of Settlement

3/19/2019 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Summons Returned Served

9/2/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

9/2/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

9/2/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

9/2/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

eSummons Issuance

7/25/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/25/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Lis Pendens

7/24/2018 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

7/24/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

7/24/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/24/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

10/4/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Directions to the Clerk

3/27/2019 - Directions to the Clerk

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

3/26/2019 - Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116096229

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Firm Name Change; Party: Plaintiff Vizcaya Community Association Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDirections to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order Approving Settlement; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115699679

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Dropping Party(S); Comment (Unknown Spouse of Alexander Polo, Unknown Spouse of Linette Naranjo, Unknown Tenant and Unknown Tenant Two ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115301823

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; August 25th, 2018; Party: Defendant Polo, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; August 25th, 2018; Party: Defendant Naranjo, Linette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant Unkown Spouse of Alexander Polo

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: DAVID IGLESIAS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A101127; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenanat One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenant Two

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Naranjo, Linette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Polo, Alexander

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Spouse of Linette Naranjo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unkown Spouse of Alexander Polo

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vizcaya Community Assn Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Iglesias, David D