This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 23:27:03 (UTC).

Verity Health Center PA Plaintiff vs. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/15/2018 Verity Health Center PA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2120

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Verity Health Center PA

Rutherford, Michelle

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daly, John C, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Daly PA

8551 W. Sunrise Blvd., Ste#304

Plantation, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

Golovin, Jeffrey W

Attorney at Dutton Law Group PA

800 West Cypress Creek Road, Suite 400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

3/21/2019 - County - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Motion for Attorney Fees

5/18/2018 - Motion for Attorney Fees

Notice of Cancellation

5/11/2018 - Notice of Cancellation

Confession of Judgment

5/11/2018 - Confession of Judgment

Notice of Filing

5/7/2018 - Notice of Filing

Amended Motion

4/26/2018 - Amended Motion

Amended Notice of Hearing

4/26/2018 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

4/20/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Dismiss

4/17/2018 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Change of Venue

4/12/2018 - Motion for Change of Venue

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/29/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing Affidavit

3/26/2018 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

Notice of Appearance

3/16/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial

3/16/2018 - Demand for Jury Trial

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

1/15/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

1/15/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4/4/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115720638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounty - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Party: Plaintiff Verity Health Center PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfession of Judgment; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Hearing Notebook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Motion; TO TRANSFER VENUE TO LEON CTY FL; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 260; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Affidavit; ofGinger Lane in Support ofDefendant's Motion to Transfer Venue; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A026543; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN C DALY JR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A026543; Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less