This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/27/2022 at 05:01:14 (UTC).

Velocity Investments LLC Plaintiff vs. Glenn Pryor Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Velocity Investments LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Glenn Pryor Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cawthon, Corey Amanda. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8320

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cawthon, Corey Amanda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments LLC

Defendant

Pryor, Glenn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hempfling, Jonathan P

5104 S Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant Attorney

Weston, Michael W

177 West Gray Street

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

7/23/2020 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

7/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

7/23/2020 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order Approving Settlement

4/26/2021 - Order Approving Settlement

Summons Served - Substitute Service

8/6/2020 - Summons Served - Substitute Service

Notice of Appearance

8/19/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

8/19/2020 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Continuance

9/2/2020 - Motion for Continuance

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

9/23/2020 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Stipulation

4/20/2021 - Stipulation

Stipulation

4/23/2021 - Stipulation

Affidavit

5/19/2021 - Affidavit

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT; Party: Plaintiff Velocity Investments LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Comment ((04-26-2021) ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 117225705

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; order required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; order required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; settled (09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 61 Cawthon, Corey Amanda; Location: https://17thflcourts.zoom.us/j/606672692

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance; AND TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (AGREED); Party: Defendant Pryor, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Pryor, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Pryor, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served - Substitute Service; 8/5/2020; Party: Defendant Pryor, Glenn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $3,147.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTON , MICHAEL W