Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 22:58:06 (UTC).

Velocity Alternative Medicine Consultants Inc Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Velocity Alternative Medicine Consultants Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schiff, Louis H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2670

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schiff, Louis H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Velocity Alternative Medicine Consultants Inc

Vergara, Carlos

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulopoulos, Theophilos G

Attorney at The Schiller Keller Group PLC

7501 W Oakland Park Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33319

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

2/2/2021 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

1/28/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

1/28/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

1/28/2021 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Interrogatories

1/28/2021 - Interrogatories

Request for Production

1/28/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

1/28/2021 - Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 71 Schiff, Louis H.; Location: North Courtroom 3; CANCELED: Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPre-trial Cancelled Per AO 2020-85-CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; 2-2-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF; Party: Plaintiff Velocity Alternative Medicine Consultants Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Party: Plaintiff Velocity Alternative Medicine Consultants Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; FIRST; Party: Plaintiff Velocity Alternative Medicine Consultants Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICAL CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Poulopoulos, Theophilos G