This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/20/2023 at 09:11:49 (UTC).

Vanessa A Cespedes, et al Plaintiff vs. UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Vanessa A Cespedes, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1749

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cespedes, Vanessa A

Cespedes, Edward A

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Low, David, ESQ.

Canaura, Jose M, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Princilis, Berjolyna

Dennison, Alexander Scott

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service

1/19/2023 - Notice of Service

Notice of Settlement

1/19/2023 - Notice of Settlement

Notice of Unavailability

12/21/2022 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Service

11/14/2022 - Notice of Service

Response to Request for Production

11/14/2022 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

11/14/2022 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Admissions

11/14/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Compliance

10/7/2022 - Notice of Compliance

Agreed Order

10/5/2022 - Agreed Order

Motion for Extension of Time

9/28/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Case Management Order

9/14/2022 - Case Management Order

Answer to Complaint

9/12/2022 - Answer to Complaint

Appearance As Attorney of Record

8/30/2022 - Appearance As Attorney of Record

Request for Admissions

8/29/2022 - Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

8/29/2022 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

8/29/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Appearance

8/29/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service

8/24/2022 - Notice of Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Directions to Clerk-Disposed; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 2; Instrument Number: 118683296

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service; Additional Text; OF DANIS INDUSTRIES OFFER LETTER TO PLAINTIFFS; Party: Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Settlement; Additional Text; Party: Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Privilege Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Compliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: Defendant UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $30,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Cespedes, Vanessa A Plaintiff Cespedes, Edward A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Admissions; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Cespedes, Vanessa A Plaintiff Cespedes, Edward A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request to Produce; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Cespedes, Vanessa A Plaintiff Cespedes, Edward A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Interrogatories; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Cespedes, Vanessa A Plaintiff Cespedes, Edward A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less