This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:00:53 (UTC).

Valerie Fenton Plaintiff vs. Wellpath LLC , et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Valerie Fenton Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Wellpath LLC , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5669

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fenton , Valerie

Defendants

Wellpath LLC

Tony , Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauer, Greg

644 Se 5Th Ave

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-3104

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Petition (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Petition (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; cace2014966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less