This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/20/2020 at 14:22:52 (UTC).

UV Cite II LLC Plaintiff vs. U.S. Bank National Association, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 UV Cite II LLC Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against U S Bank National Association, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1880

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UV Cite II LLC

Defendants

U.S. Bank National Association

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

On Behalf of the Holders of the Home Equity Asser Trust 2005-8

As Trustee

As certificate Trustee on Behalf of Bosco Credit II Trust Series 2010-1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Zendegui, Gustavo

1111 Kane Concourse, Ste 310

Bay Harbor Islands, FL 33154

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

2/12/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

2/12/2020 - eSummons Not Issued - Atty advised

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/12/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

1/31/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/31/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Not Issued - Atty advised; def name must match petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR QUIETING TITLE UNDER F.S. 65.061; Party: Plaintiff UV Cite II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less