This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2020 at 23:12:46 (UTC).

UTL Inc Plaintiff vs. AAST Trucking Inc Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 UTL Inc Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AAST Trucking Inc Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4678

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UTL Inc

Defendant

AAST Trucking Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chester, Mitchell A

Attorney at Law Office of Mitchell A. Chester, P.A.

7951 Sw 6Th Street, Suite 112

Plantation, FL 33324-3211

Defendant Attorney

Rodal, Yechezkel

5300 Nw 33Rd Ave, Ste 219

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Showing of Good Cause

2/12/2020 - Showing of Good Cause

Motion to Withdraw

1/15/2020 - Motion to Withdraw

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

12/16/2019 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Notice of Cancellation

1/31/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Readiness for Trial

1/31/2019 - Notice of Readiness for Trial

Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

1/29/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

1/21/2019 - Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

Agreed Order Granting

1/14/2019 - Agreed Order Granting

Motion for Enlargement of Time

11/1/2018 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Notice of Service of Interrogs

10/4/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

9/4/2018 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

8/23/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Filing

8/22/2018 - Notice of Filing

Agreed Order

8/6/2018 - Agreed Order

Notice of Appearance

8/3/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

8/3/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

eSummons Issuance

6/27/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

6/18/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketShowing of Good Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; Party: Attorney Chester, Mitchell A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCircuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Readiness for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order Granting; Motion for Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Party: Plaintiff UTL Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Defendant AAST Trucking Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Order; Mot for Extension of Time to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant AAST Trucking Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant AAST Trucking Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MITCHELL CHESTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A088315; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; AAST Trucking Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MITCHELL CHESTER ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A083852; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff UTL Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U T L Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodal, Yechezkel