This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:35:46 (UTC).

U.S. Bank Trust National Association Plaintiff vs. Paul A. Dinardo, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 U S Bank Trust National Association Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Paul A Dinardo, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1950

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank Trust National Association

Defendants

Dinardo, Paul A.

Dinardo, Barbara J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nussbaum, William, ESQ.

Attorney at GARY GASSEL PA

2191 Ringling Boulevard

Sarasota, FL 34237

Gassel, Gary I

Attorney at Law Office of Gary I Gassel PA

2191 Ringling Boulevard

Sarasota, FL 34237-7003

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

Summons Returned Served

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

2/14/2020 - Summons Returned Unserved

Civil Cover Sheet

1/31/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Filing

1/31/2020 - Notice of Filing

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/31/2020 - eSummons Issuance

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/5/20 Barbara Dinardo; Party: Defendant Dinardo, Paul A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted; Unknown spouse of Paul A. Dinardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/5/20; Party: Defendant Dinardo, Barbara J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Unknown spouse of Barbara J. Dinardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/5/20 Gianna Denardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Tenant II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Tenant III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Tenant IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $143,816.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); VERIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; CERTIFICATION REGARDING POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Dinardo, Barbara J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Dinardo, Paul A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA J. DINARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PAUL A. DINARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; TENANT I/UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; TENANT II/UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; TENANT III/UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; TENANT IV/UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less