This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/11/2023 at 15:42:58 (UTC).

US Bank National Association Plaintiff vs. Donald Ambroise, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 US Bank National Association Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Donald Ambroise, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Garcia-Wood, Marina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6810

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Garcia-Wood, Marina

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Bank National Association

Defendants

Ambroise, Donald

Ambroise, Arliomey P

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

Sunset Falls Homeowners Association Inc

City Of Lauderhill Florida

Green Tree Servicing LLC

Fischer & Feldman PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diskin, Lara, ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

Lara, John Felice

Piccin, Raymond Anthony

 

Court Documents

Motion

4/27/2023 - Motion

Motion to Dismiss

2/27/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Service

2/21/2023 - Notice of Service

Order Extending Time

2/10/2023 - Order Extending Time

Notice of Appearance

2/6/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Unavailability

2/6/2023 - Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Hearing

12/16/2022 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

12/1/2022 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic

11/28/2022 - Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/10/2022 - eSummons Issuance

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Dismiss; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Extending Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic; Additional Text; Defendant, Unknown Parties in Possession #2, If living, and all Unknown Parties claiming by, through, under and against the above named Defendant(s) who are not known to be dead or alive, whether said Unknown Parties may claim an interest as Spouse, Heirs, Devisees, Grantees, or Other Claimants pursuant to Fla. R. Civ. P. 1.250(b

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Default; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Ambroise, Arliomey P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DONALD AMBROISE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Sunset Falls Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant City Of Lauderhill Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Fischer Feldman PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less