This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/26/2022 at 19:02:00 (UTC).

US Bank National Association Plaintiff vs. James M Adams Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 US Bank National Association Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against James M Adams Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1454

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US Bank National Association

Indenture Trustee of CIM Trust 2019-R1 on Behalf of the Noteholders

Defendant

Adams, James M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Taylor, Shawn Lee

Attorney at Deluca Law Group PLLC

2101 Ne 26Th Street

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33305

Paggi, Joseph Gerard, III

Attorney at DeLuca Law Group

2101 Ne 26Th St

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33305-1535

Defendant Attorneys

Stabenow, Tony L, ESQ.

Attorney at The Stabenow Law Firm PLLC

3725 Ne 167 St, #200

North Miami Beach, FL 33160

Rowe, Lisa G, ESQ.

Attorney at LISA G ROWE P.A.

525 Antioch Ave, #1

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

 

Court Documents

Motion to Abate

4/17/2022 - Motion to Abate

Notice of Hearing

4/17/2022 - Notice of Hearing

Certificate of Service

4/15/2022 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting Case Management Conference

4/12/2022 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing

3/16/2022 - Notice of Hearing

Certificate of Service

2/10/2022 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting Case Management Conference

2/8/2022 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Certificate of Service

12/16/2021 - Certificate of Service

Order Setting Case Management Conference

12/9/2021 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Civil Cover Sheet

6/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

6/10/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Lis Pendens

6/10/2021 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Value Claim Form

6/10/2021 - Value Claim Form

eSummons Issuance

6/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Abate; DEFENDANT JAMES M. ADAMS' AMENDED MOTION TO ABATE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; CROSS-NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING APRIL 18 2022 @ 02:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 06-13-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Party: Plaintiff US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 04-12-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; OF ORDER; Party: Plaintiff US Bank National Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 02-08-2022 at 8:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE; Party: Plaintiff US Bank National Association, Not In Its Indivi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Party: Plaintiff US Bank National Association, Not In Its Indivi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Adams, James M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES M. ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less