This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/13/2021 at 18:31:49 (UTC).

US Bank NA Plaintiff vs. Louis E Silver, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 US Bank NA Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Louis E Silver, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5561

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

US Bank NA

Home Equity Loan Trust Series OOMC 2006-HE3

Defendants

Condom, Jesus

Condom, Yesica

State of Florida Dept of Revenue

Silver, Louis E

Ruiz, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sandman, Erin L, ESQ.

Attorney at Van Ness Law Firm, PLC

1239 E. Newport Center Drive, Suite 110

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

 

Court Documents

Letter Returned From Post Office

3/9/2017 - Letter Returned From Post Office

Certificate of Title

12/20/2016 - Certificate of Title

Bid Sheet

12/7/2016 - Bid Sheet

Certificate of Sale

12/7/2016 - Certificate of Sale

Proof of Publication

11/22/2016 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

11/4/2016 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Certificate of Mailing

11/4/2016 - Certificate of Mailing

Final Disposition Form

10/20/2016 - Final Disposition Form

Notice of Filing Affidavit

10/16/2016 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

Opposition

10/16/2016 - Opposition

Notice of Hearing

8/4/2016 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Filing

7/5/2016 - Notice of Filing

Motion for Default & Default

7/1/2016 - Motion for Default & Default

Non-Military Affidavit

7/1/2016 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Summary Final Judgment

7/1/2016 - Motion for Summary Final Judgment

Affidavit of Attorney Fees

7/1/2016 - Affidavit of Attorney Fees

Affidavit of Attorney's Time

7/1/2016 - Affidavit of Attorney's Time

Affidavit of Costs

7/1/2016 - Affidavit of Costs

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBid Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketForeclosure Sale Fee; Payor: VAN NESS LAW FIRM PLC VAN NESS; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20161RA1A012187; Amount: $70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication; SALE 12/06/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE; Party: Plaintiff US Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Sale to be Issued by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN ANTHONY VAN NESS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A125597; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN ANTHONY VAN NESS ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A125597; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANA LEE SIBILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Sibily, Ana Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff US Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2005-HE4 is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandman, Erin L, ESQ.