Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/05/2020 at 21:54:54 (UTC).

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff vs. Veterans Plumbing Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Veterans Plumbing Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6752

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Hayes, Roseann

Hayes, Thomas

Defendants

Veterans Plumbing Inc

Veterans Plumbing and Air Conditioning Inc

Leisure Gardens Assn Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cantwell, Mary M

Attorney at Markcity, Rothman, Cantwell & Breitner, P.A

Sabadell Financial Center, 150 S. Pine Island Road, Suite 250

Plantation, FL 33324-0000

Defendant Attorneys

Smith, Clark W

Attorney at Paxton & Smith, P.A.

Barristers Bldg., Suite 500, 1615 Forum Pl.

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Alan, C. Nash

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

100 Ne Third Avenue, Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

8/20/2018 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

Amended Complaint

10/19/2017 - Amended Complaint

Summons Returned Served

10/19/2017 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

10/19/2017 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Appearance

10/17/2017 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

10/17/2017 - Motion to Dismiss

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

10/17/2017 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

Request to Produce

10/17/2017 - Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

10/13/2017 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

10/11/2017 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Appearance

9/28/2017 - Notice of Appearance

Civil Cover Sheet

8/31/2017 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

8/31/2017 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

8/31/2017 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

8/31/2017 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

8/31/2017 - eSummons Issuance

Final Order

8/17/2018 - Final Order

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

1/29/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCircuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115288698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114860720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Party: Plaintiff Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; VETERANS PLUMBING INC FKA VETERANS PLUMBING AND AIR CONDITIONING INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT JOSEPH S GUILBERT - September 23, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; LEISURE GARDENS ASSOCIATION INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT ASSOCIATED CORPORATE SERVICES LLC - September 22, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AS COUNSEL FOR VETERANS PLUMBING, INC. f/k/a/ VETERANS PLUMBING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC., AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Party: Defendant Veterans Plumbing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Party: Defendant Veterans Plumbing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service; Party: Defendant Veterans Plumbing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant Leisure Gardens Assn Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: MARY M CANTWELL ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A126025; Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MARY M CANTWELL ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A126025; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: MARY M CANTWELL ESQ ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A126025; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Attorney Cantwell, Mary M; Party: Plaintiff Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; LEISURE GARDENS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; VETERANS PLUMBING INC. F/K/A VETERANS PLUMBING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nash, Alan Carroll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , ESQ, CLARK WICKHAM