********1370
02/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Broward, Florida
Cawthon, Corey Amanda
UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Impemba, Mark
Impemba, Sheri
WALKER, URSZULA
Kornfield, Gary
Gutknecht, Jason Thomas
2/24/2023 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)
2/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet
2/28/2023 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial
3/20/2023 - Notice of Appearance
3/23/2023 - Summons Returned Unserved
HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 61 Cawthon, Corey Amanda; Location: South Courtroom 230; CANCELED: Summons Unserved
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved; Additional Text; Party: Defendant WALKER, URSZULA
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of Appearance
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)
[-] Read Less