This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/01/2021 at 17:01:39 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC Plaintiff vs. Jorge Gonzalez Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/28/2013 UNIFUND CCR LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Jorge Gonzalez Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5438

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC

Defendant

Gonzalez, Jorge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sanders, Craig B, ESQ.

Kahn, Jeffrey L

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Settlement

5/2/2014 - Stipulation for Settlement

Order

5/13/2014 - Order

Summons Returned Served

4/1/2013 - Summons Returned Served

Motion for Enlargement of Time

4/16/2013 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Notice of Appearance

4/16/2013 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

9/13/2013 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

12/6/2013 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

12/27/2013 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Substitution of Counsel

12/27/2013 - Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Motion for Substitution of Party(S)

12/27/2013 - Motion for Substitution of Party(S)

Order Substituting Party

1/7/2014 - Order Substituting Party

Order Substituting Party

1/7/2014 - Order Substituting Party

Final Disposition Form

5/2/2014 - Final Disposition Form

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/13/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionOrder; Comment (APPROVING STIPULATION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AND RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION ); Vol./Book: 50789; Page: 1716; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112296842

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionStipulation for Settlement; Vol./Book: 50750; Page: 359; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 112264670

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2014

DispositionDisposed by Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2014
View Court Documents

DocketFinal Disposition Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Substituting Party; Jeffrey Kahn, Esq. of Hunt & Kahn, P.A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Substituting Party; UNIFUND CCR, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Substitution of Party(S); Party: Plaintiff Pride Acquistions LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Substitution of Counsel; Party: Plaintiff Pride Acquistions LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; JEFFREY KAHN FBN#0519200 ON BEHALF OF PL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Plaintiff Pride Acquistions LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Dismiss; PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Gonzalez, Jorge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; attorneyservices@merinolegal.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; Party: Defendant Gonzalez, Jorge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; 26th day of March, 2013 at 02 08 PM; Party: Defendant Gonzalez, Jorge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued; hb; Party: Defendant Gonzalez, Jorge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000519; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000519; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less