This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/01/2021 at 17:27:45 (UTC).

Unifund CCR LLC Plaintiff vs. Cristina J Zighelboim Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/28/2013 Unifund CCR LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Cristina J Zighelboim Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Frink, Keathan B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5463

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Frink, Keathan B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund CCR LLC

Defendant

Zighelboim, Cristina J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Fact Info Sheet

1/7/2016 - Fact Info Sheet

Affidavit

12/4/2015 - Affidavit

Affidavit

12/4/2015 - Affidavit

Notice of Filing

12/4/2015 - Notice of Filing

Motion

12/4/2015 - Motion

Memo

10/14/2015 - Memo

Motion for Default

10/12/2015 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

10/12/2015 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default

10/12/2015 - Default

Alias Summons Returned Served

9/1/2015 - Alias Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance - Alias

8/17/2015 - eSummons Issuance - Alias

Order

7/14/2015 - Order

Motion for Extension of Time

7/2/2015 - Motion for Extension of Time

Summons Returned Unserved

11/12/2014 - Summons Returned Unserved

Amended Complaint

8/29/2014 - Amended Complaint

eSummons Issuance - On Amended

8/29/2014 - eSummons Issuance - On Amended

Order Granting

7/17/2014 - Order Granting

Motion for Extension of Time

7/2/2014 - Motion for Extension of Time

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/07/2016

DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2016
View Court Documents

DocketFact Info Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2015
View Court Documents

DispositionFinal Default Judgment; Comment (IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 113397968

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2015

DispositionDisposed by Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit; OF INTEREST; Party: Attorney Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.; Party: Attorney Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit; OF COSTS; Party: Attorney Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.; Party: Attorney Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing; Affidavit of Indebtedness; Party: Plaintiff Unifund CCR LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2015
View Court Documents

DocketMotion; FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Party: Plaintiff Unifund CCR LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2015
View Court Documents

DocketMemo; DEFAULT ENTERED ON 10/12/15.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2015
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Default; Party: Plaintiff Unifund CCR LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
07/02/2014
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO SERVE DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Unifund CCR LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Granting Motion; TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2014
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Substitution of Party(S); PL; Party: Plaintiff Thunderbolt Holdings LTD, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Substitution of Counsel; That O&L Law Group, P.L. is substituted as counsel of record for the Plaintiff, THUNDERBOLT HOLDINGS LTD., LLC,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Substitution of Counsel; Party: Plaintiff Thunderbolt Holdings LTD, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued; Party: Defendant Zighelboim, Cristina J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000521; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000521; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less