This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 02:12:25 (UTC).

Uhg I Llc Plaintiff vs. Alexis Williams Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Uhg I Llc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alexis Williams Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilman, Allison. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0546

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gilman, Allison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Uhg I Llc

Defendant

Williams, Alexis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Masin, Hunter Michael

 

Court Documents

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

1/23/2023 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

1/23/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

2/27/2023 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

1/30/2023 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Summons Returned Unserved

2/23/2023 - Summons Returned Unserved

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 60 Gilman, Allison; Location: South Courtroom 210; CANCELED: Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition(s): Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; Pages: 1; Instrument Number: 118701748

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less