This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 14:29:25 (UTC).

U S Bank Trust National Association Plaintiff vs. Francisco Pistoni, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 U S Bank Trust National Association Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Francisco Pistoni, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2085

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S Bank Trust National Association

Defendants

Pistoni, Francisco

Omega Condominium No 3 Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, ADAM G, ESQ.

Attorney at SHD Legal Group PA

499 Nw 70Th Ave, Suite 309

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

2/21/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/21/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Response

2/17/2020 - Response

Civil Cover Sheet

2/4/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/4/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Value Claim Form

2/4/2020 - Value Claim Form

eSummons Issuance

2/4/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/4/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/4/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/4/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/4/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/21/20; Party: Defendant Omega Condominium No 3 Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/12/20; Party: Defendant Pistoni, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Party: Defendant Pistoni, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $113,425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Pistoni, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Omega Condominium No 3 Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; To: UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; To: Unknown Tenant No. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff U S Bank Trust National Association

    Read MoreRead Less