This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/03/2020 at 19:23:10 (UTC).

Tyler Blevins Plaintiff vs. Dollar Bank FSB Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Tyler Blevins Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Dollar Bank FSB Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0606

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blevins, Tyler

Defendant

Dollar Bank FSB

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

10/23/2019 - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice

Complaint (eFiled)

10/4/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

10/4/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Motion for Approval

10/21/2019 - Motion for Approval

Exhibits

10/22/2019 - Exhibits

Exhibits

10/22/2019 - Exhibits

Exhibits

10/22/2019 - Exhibits

Exhibits

10/23/2019 - Exhibits

Exhibits

10/23/2019 - Exhibits

Exhibits

10/23/2019 - Exhibits

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal With Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116134204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Pursuant to Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; JOINT STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; NOTICE OF FILING AGREED ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND AUTHORIZING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; EXHIBIT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; EXHIBIT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits; EXHIBIT 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Approval; UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND AUTHORIZING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND OPPORTUNITY TO FILE CONSENT TO JOIN AND RELEASE FORMS, AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Plaintiff Blevins, Tyler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: LISA BOSWORTH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A186740; Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); collective actio; Party: Plaintiff Blevins, Tyler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less