This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/04/2020 at 14:28:10 (UTC).

Truist Bank Plaintiff vs. Vincent Prochilo, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Truist Bank Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Vincent Prochilo, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1229

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Truist Bank

Sun Trust Bank

Vanderbilt Estates Property Owners Association Inc

Prochilo, Melissa

United States Of America

Prochilo, Vincent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthousis, Julie, ESQ.

Attorney at Brock & Scott, PLLC

2001 Nw 64Th Street, Suite 130

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

1/30/2020 - Final Disposition Form

Civil Cover Sheet

1/22/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/22/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Value Claim Form

1/22/2020 - Value Claim Form

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/22/2020 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Filing

1/22/2020 - Notice of Filing

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/22/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

1/30/2020 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116325822

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $283,764.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; Party: Plaintiff Truist Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form; Party: Plaintiff Truist Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Party: Plaintiff Truist Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Party: Plaintiff Truist Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Prochilo, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Prochilo, Melissa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Truist Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Vanderbilt Estates Property Owners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant United States Of America

    Read MoreRead Less