This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/29/2022 at 10:27:19 (UTC).

Tropical Financial Credit Union Plaintiff vs. Michael Anthony Amendolaro Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Tropical Financial Credit Union Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Anthony Amendolaro Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barner, Florence Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8878

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barner, Florence Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tropical Financial Credit Union

Defendant

Amendolaro, Michael Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kligler, Joshua C.

66 W. Flagler Street, Suite 400

Miami, FL 33130-1807

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

4/1/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

4/5/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

4/5/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPICAL FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C