This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:26:51 (UTC).

Tri-County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC Plaintiff vs. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 Tri-County Diagnostic Imaging Centers LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fry, John D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3133

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fry, John D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tri-County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC

Pierre, Jackson

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christensen, Chad

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487-0000

Defendant Attorney

Itayim, Sam H

Attorney at Kubicki Draper

One E Broward Blvd, Suite 1600

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

12/11/2019 - Case Management Order

Notice of Hearing

10/11/2019 - Notice of Hearing

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

4/29/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Filing

2/4/2019 - Notice of Filing

Motion to Compel

2/4/2019 - Motion to Compel

Copy

2/4/2019 - Copy

Notice of Taking Deposition

2/4/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Admissions

2/4/2019 - Request for Admissions

Motion for Extension of Time

2/4/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

2/4/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing

2/4/2019 - Notice of Filing

Response

2/4/2019 - Response

Motion to Compel

2/4/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Taking Deposition

2/4/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Stipulation

2/4/2019 - Stipulation

Motion to Transfer

2/4/2019 - Motion to Transfer

Notice of Cancellation

2/4/2019 - Notice of Cancellation

Motion to Compel

2/4/2019 - Motion to Compel

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116346646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Party: Plaintiff Tri-County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExpert Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; VENUE; Party: Plaintiff Tri-County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy; ORDER GRANTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; OF PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; OF ORDER GRANTING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketComment:; ******Case transferred from Palm Beach to Broward County******

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation; OF HEARING; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; COMPLIANCE; Party: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy; OF AGREED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation; OF DEPOSITION; Party: Plaintiff Tri-County Diagnostic & Imaging Centers LLC

    Read MoreRead Less