This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/22/2023 at 02:07:31 (UTC).

Tracey Cabanis Plaintiff vs. Comcast Cable Communications LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/10/2023 Tracey Cabanis Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Comcast Cable Communications LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schiff, Louis H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1306

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schiff, Louis H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cabanis, Tracey

Defendants

Comcast Cable Communications LLC

Xfinity

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patti, Thomas J

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

2/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Discovery

2/13/2023 - Request for Discovery

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/13/2023 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/14/2023 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Summons Returned Served

2/24/2023 - Summons Returned Served

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/20/2023 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Mediation Report

3/20/2023 - Mediation Report

Authorization

3/20/2023 - Authorization

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/21/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 71 Schiff, Louis H.; Location: North Courtroom 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization; Additional Text; to Represent; Party: Defendant Comcast Cable Communications LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Mediation Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference; Additional Text; Court shall set Status Conference for May 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 2/16/23; Party: Defendant Comcast Cable Communications LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Comcast Cable Communications LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Discovery; Additional Text; DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Cabanis, Tracey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less