This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 20:26:59 (UTC).

Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach, Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Total Care Chiropractic Rehab North Miami Beach, Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Feld, Ellen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3137

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Feld, Ellen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach,

Lampkin, Edwin

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barber, Matthew C, ESQ.

Attorney at Matthew C Barber PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd #304

Plantation, FL 33322-4007

Defendant Attorney

Storelli, Christie

6700 North Andrews Avenue, Ste 404

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/19/2019 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/19/2019 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

3/25/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/11/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

4/11/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

4/11/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Filing Deposition

4/11/2019 - Notice of Filing Deposition

Notice of Filing

4/11/2019 - Notice of Filing

Answer to Complaint

7/8/2019 - Answer to Complaint

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

7/29/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Compel Discovery

8/22/2019 - Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Appearance

11/7/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Response to Request for Production

12/6/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Admissions

12/6/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogs

12/6/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; Party: Plaintiff Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Deposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 83 Feld, Ellen; Location: West Courtroom 240; CANCELED: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A027120; Amount: $55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JOHN DALY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A027120; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Care Chiropractic & Rehab North Miami Beach, is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Storelli, Christie