This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 08/07/2021 at 14:16:07 (UTC).

T.I.O. Medical Intervention, LLC. Plaintiff vs. Geico General Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/11/2021 T I O Medical Intervention, LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miranda, Giuseppina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8824

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miranda, Giuseppina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T.I.O. Medical Intervention, LLC.

Matin, Mitra

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abramowitz, Ross

Attorney at The Injury Firm

1608 East Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334

Defendant Attorney

Storelli, Christie

Attorney at The Law Office of George L Cimballa III

600 N Pine Island Road, Ste 400

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

7/11/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

7/11/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

7/16/2021 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

Answer to Complaint

8/5/2021 - Answer to Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; July 16, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • DocketPer AO 2020-85-CO-Rules of Civil Procedure Invoked (No PTH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less