This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/01/2021 at 17:33:08 (UTC).

Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC Plaintiff vs. Linda M Considine Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/28/2013 Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Linda M Considine Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5468

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC

Defendant

Considine, Linda M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanders, Craig B, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Final Order of Dismissal

7/22/2014 - Final Order of Dismissal

Notice of Lack of Prosecution

3/24/2014 - Notice of Lack of Prosecution

Order to Show Cause

6/5/2014 - Order to Show Cause

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2014
View Court Documents

DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 50952; Page: 11; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 112421813

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2014

DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Lack of Prosecutuion / 07/11/14 at 10:00 rm 950

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Lack of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2013

DocketSummons Returned Served; 3/11/13; Party: Defendant Considine, Linda M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued; Party: Defendant Considine, Linda M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000523; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000523; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less