This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/01/2021 at 17:34:24 (UTC).

Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC Plaintiff vs. Arlene Gordon Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/28/2013 Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Arlene Gordon Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5470

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC

Defendant

Gordon, Arlene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanders, Craig B, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

4/4/2013 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

4/4/2013 - Summons Returned Served

Response

4/8/2013 - Response

Notice of Appearance

12/6/2013 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Substitution of Party(S)

12/13/2013 - Motion for Substitution of Party(S)

Motion for Substitution of Counsel

12/13/2013 - Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Lack of Prosecution

12/9/2014 - Notice of Lack of Prosecution

Notice of Lack of Prosecution

4/20/2016 - Notice of Lack of Prosecution

Suggestion of Bankruptcy

5/3/2016 - Suggestion of Bankruptcy

Order Placing Case on Inactive Status

6/22/2016 - Order Placing Case on Inactive Status

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2016
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Placing Case on Inactive Status

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2016
View Court Documents

DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy; Case number 14-18328-JKO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Lack of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Lack of Prosecution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Substitution of Counsel; Party: Plaintiff Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Substitution of Party(S); Party: Plaintiff Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Plaintiff Thunderbolt Holdings LTD LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2013
View Court Documents

DocketResponse; to the Complaint / ATTACHED EXHIBIT; Party: Defendant Gordon, Arlene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; 03/23/13; Party: Defendant Gordon, Arlene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; 3/23/2013; Party: Defendant Gordon, Arlene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued; Party: Defendant Gordon, Arlene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000524; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2013

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SANDERS ESQ, CRAIG B ; Userid: CTS-drussell bennett ; Receipt: 20132YA2A000524; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less